Financial history BOXING4LIFE

Charity number: 1155607
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £39.60k £25.58k £19.84k £10.99k £10.54k
Total expenditure £39.24k £22.47k £26.07k £7.91k £2.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £1.20k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.30k £2.45k N/A £6.77k N/A