Trustees BOXING4LIFE

Charity number: 1155607
Charity reporting is up to date (51 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
TERENCE WHEELER Chair 21 November 2013
None on record
Peter Sandy Trustee 20 September 2021
None on record
Tim Carey Trustee 08 March 2018
None on record
Aamir Akram Trustee 16 November 2016
None on record
Hazel Sills Trustee 30 July 2015
None on record
MARK RULE Trustee 21 November 2013
None on record