SOUTH LIVERPOOL FOODBANK

Charity number: 1156466
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £29.65k £25.61k £36.81k £57.75k £82.35k
Total expenditure £28.86k £36.17k £28.25k £45.77k £69.99k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A