Financial history WOODSIDE PARK ERUV COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1157984
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £5.99k £9.94k £3.71k £7.22k £7.51k
Total expenditure £12.29k £11.28k £2.17k £8.56k £7.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A