KNIGHTON HOSPITAL AND COMMUNITY LEAGUE OF FRIENDS

Charity number: 504349
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021
Total gross income £4.93k £13.03k £2.80k £2.55k £1.18k
Total expenditure £11.42k £24.54k £16.50k £20.41k £7.69k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A