INNOVATION FOR AGRICULTURE

Charity number: 1155563
Charity reporting is up to date (17 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 November 2020 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 November 2020 17 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 25 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 25 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 26 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 26 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 22 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 23 August 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 01 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 01 August 2016 On time Download