INNOVATION FOR AGRICULTURE

Charity number: 1155563
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £352.29k £516.43k £651.78k £833.75k £666.58k
Total expenditure £343.22k £495.15k £621.35k £785.00k £573.42k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £91.61k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £455.82k £546.13k £738.95k £628.89k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £60.62k £105.65k £94.80k £37.69k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £103.03k
Income - Investment N/A £0 £0 £0 £3
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £525.86k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £441.12k £563.46k £740.04k £562.03k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £54.03k £51.90k £44.95k £11.39k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £4.72k £6.00k £0 £517.10k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £4.72k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £6.00k £0 £0