BARNES COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1156379
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Thomas Edward Barnett Trustee 10 November 2020 None on record
Raphael Zachary-Younger Trustee 04 July 2019 None on record
PHILIP HUW THOMAS Trustee 21 May 2015 None on record
Matthew John Purser Trustee 10 November 2020 None on record
Alison Cowpe Trustee 28 April 2016 None on record
John Ian McNeilly Trustee 10 November 2020 None on record
James Christopher Felix Trustee 01 June 2017 None on record
NICKI URQUHART Chair 21 May 2015 None on record
Adam John Lockwood Trustee 10 November 2020 None on record
Helen Edwards Trustee 11 April 2019 None on record