Financial history Tarutta Welfare Trust

Charity number: 1155704
Charity reporting is overdue by 76 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022
Total gross income £12.50k £14.80k £16.00k £4.25k £100
Total expenditure £8.50k £9.00k £10.30k £300 £2.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A