YOUTH LEADS UK

Charity number: 1155789
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 06/04/2017 06/04/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £77.64k £98.77k £91.44k £125.34k £231.01k
Total expenditure £38.28k £109.24k £114.31k £130.80k £163.72k
Income from government contracts £0 £11.25k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £15.00k £7.25k £32.00k