MINORITY COMMUNITY AID

Charity number: 1160722
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 01 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

01 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 12 August 2020 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 12 August 2020 43 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 22 July 2019 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 22 July 2019 22 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 09 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 30 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required