Trustees THE FRIENDS OF YSGOL CEDEWAIN (SPECIAL SCHOOL)
Charity number: 504391
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DARREN LEACH | Chair | 29 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Georgie Grant | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
NATALIE ANNE DAVIES NATALIE | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOHN DAVIES MIKE | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
NEIL JONES | Trustee | 19 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE REES CLAIRE | Trustee | 19 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
JAYNE HILL | Trustee | 20 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
PIPPA SILLITOE | Trustee | 24 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
CORNISH Sandilands Gill | Trustee | 12 March 1990 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Smith Mike | Trustee | 12 September 1979 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE ANNE PUGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RUTH DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.