CLARETS IN THE COMMUNITY LIMITED

Charity number: 1155856
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £924.18k £1.69m £2.52m £3.71m £3.97m
Total expenditure £886.54k £1.55m £2.23m £3.11m £3.42m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £41.44k £64.74k £269.90k
Income from government grants £0 £0 £45.00k £103.42k £87.13k
Income - Donations and legacies £67.45k £243.18k £480.18k £1.10m £810.59k
Income - Other trading activities £94.93k £117.72k £179.68k £333.92k £332.14k
Income - Charitable activities £761.48k £1.33m £1.86m £2.28m £2.63m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £324 £591 £155 £271 £312
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £194.67k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £821.35k £1.49m £2.12m £2.89m £3.36m
Expenditure - Raising funds £61.05k £56.28k £104.48k £214.71k £54.21k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £1.07k £9.02k £12.53k £6.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £4.14k £4.15k £11.29k £6.48k £1.51k