THE CHORAL FOUNDATION FOR ST MARY LE TOWER CHURCH, IPSWICH

Charity number: 1157955
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £8.45k £7.01k £2.41k £4.62k £12.79k
Total expenditure £5.73k £375 £2.97k £5.89k £508
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A