LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF WORKINGTON INFIRMARY

Charity number: 504408
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £0 £1.05k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £765 £4.73k £46.50k £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A