THE SNOW SPORTS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1158955
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £165.04k £101.46k £1.19k £2.15k £62.57k
Total expenditure £31.09k £43.19k £111.28k £36.27k £70.85k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A