WELSH BLACK CATTLE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1159937
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 November 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

01 November 2021 1 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 November 2020 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 08 February 2021 100 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 14 January 2020 75 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 08 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 02 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 17 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 23 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 11 October 2017 On time Download