Accounts and annual returns WORKSOP AND DISTRICT U3A

Charity number: 1156668
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 February 2021 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 February 2021 25 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 02 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 24 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 24 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required