Financial history WASHINGTON MIND CIO

Charity number: 1156010
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £653.92k £610.84k £692.38k £783.64k £828.96k
Total expenditure £642.96k £627.98k £584.35k £676.66k £643.18k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A £75.96k
Income from government grants £404.16k £416.91k £417.73k £374.28k £61.81k
Income - Donations and legacies £519.64k £470.93k £581.06k £645.98k £747.70k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £134.10k £139.79k £110.93k £137.03k £81.01k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £173 £115 £384 £640 £250
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £642.96k £627.98k £584.35k £676.66k £643.18k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £3.25k £3.30k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0