MARKET HARBOROUGH AND THE BOWDENS CHARITY

Charity number: 1157787
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £0 £0 £693.28k £711.28k £766.46k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £553.07k £771.87k £892.54k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £2.84k £0 £9.15k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £85.81k £86.10k £98.34k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £604.62k £622.67k £658.85k
Income - Other N/A N/A £13 £2.50k £123
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £491.58k £634.21k £804.89k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £61.49k £137.66k £87.65k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £45.38k £38.99k £37.45k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £133.10k £227.55k £396.55k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £53.96k £129.03k £78.31k
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0