Trustees THE HISTORIC TOWNS TRUST

Charity number: 1160040
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Keith Douglas Lilley Chair 24 June 2015
THE COUNCIL FOR BRITISH ARCHAEOLOGY
Received: On time
JOHN NICHOLAS MOORE Trustee 12 November 2020
None on record
Dr ALICE MARJORIE SHEILA PROCHASKA Trustee 21 June 2018
BOOK AID INTERNATIONAL
Received: On time
Dr Keith Peter Parry Trustee 15 November 2017
THE OXFORDSHIRE RECORD SOCIETY
Received: On time
PROFESSOR MS HELEN ELIZABETH FULTON Trustee 03 March 2017
HONOURABLE SOCIETY OF CYMMRODORION
Received: On time
NICK MILLEA Trustee 24 June 2015
IMAGO MUNDI LIMITED
Received: On time
PROFESSOR CAROLINE MARY BARRON Trustee 24 June 2015
LONDON RECORD SOCIETY
Received: On time
RICHARD III AND YORKIST HISTORY TRUST
Received: On time
Professor Vanessa Ann Harding Trustee 24 June 2015
LONDON RECORD SOCIETY
Received: On time
ROEY SWEET Trustee 24 June 2015
MARC FITCH FUND
Received: On time
THE BRITISH SCHOOL AT ROME
Received: On time
JULIAN MUNBY BA, FSA Trustee 24 June 2015
THE OXFORD PRESERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
Dr SARAH RUTH REES JONES PHD, FSA Trustee 24 June 2015
None on record
PROF ADRIAN ALEXANDER CHRISTIAN PHILLIPS CBE, MA. Trustee 24 June 2015
None on record
PROFESSOR MATTHEW PAUL DAVIES MA, DPHIl. Trustee 24 June 2015
None on record