Trustees ELEMENT SOCIETY

Charity number: 1157932
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ian Clarke Trustee 16 December 2021
None on record
Douglas Tafadzwa Muzawazi Trustee 18 March 2021
None on record
Dr Sally Ann Jackson Trustee 12 February 2019
None on record
Adrian Rattenbury Trustee 12 February 2019
None on record
Gregory Paul Burke Trustee 13 November 2018
None on record
Hugh Mann Adamson Trustee 26 January 2017
None on record
Joseph John Parkinson Trustee 01 January 2016
None on record
IAN ALEXANDER BALSHAW Trustee 01 April 2014
None on record