WELWYN HATFIELD WOMEN'S REFUGE AND SUPPORT SERVICES

Charity number: 1156186
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £262.88k £272.62k £272.62k £278.00k £280.68k
Total expenditure £257.53k £300.39k £300.39k £287.00k £286.97k
Income from government contracts £66.39k £66.50k £46.91k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £34.00k £32.00k £31.07k £31.10k £31.07k