Accounts and annual returns SOUTHERN BROOKS COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIPS

Charity number: 1157061
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 09 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 09 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 09 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 27 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 27 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 07 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 19 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window