Financial history THE CHARTERED CERTIFIED ACCOUNTANTS BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 1156341
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £213.44k £203.84k £337.43k £224.53k £175.00k
Total expenditure £60.24k £79.57k £136.02k £133.59k £81.22k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A