Trustees HOWICK VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity number: 1156634
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Tracy Louise Collins PhdMSCBSc. Trustee 13 January 2019
None on record
John Roper BsC CENG Trustee 08 October 2018
None on record
Lynsey Punton Trustee 19 January 2016
None on record
John David Jackson MA Trustee 13 November 2013
None on record
AUDREY GAIL JAMIESON MBE Trustee 10 July 2012
None on record
JOHN ROSS HAUGHIE Trustee 09 September 2010
None on record
STEWART SEXTON Trustee 02 September 2010
None on record
JANE LOUISE DOLEMAN MCIPD Trustee 02 September 2010
None on record
CHERYL SPARK Trustee 08 January 2010
None on record
PHILIP HUDSON SPARK BSC CENG Trustee 05 May 2009
None on record
LADY CLARE NICOLETTE HOWICK Trustee 05 May 2009
None on record
JEANETTE ARCHBOLD Trustee 05 May 2009
None on record