Financial history THE EARDSTAPA TRUST

Charity number: 1156221
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £7.48k £5.93k £7.56k £2.83k £2.78k
Total expenditure £12.41k £1.07k £11.17k £4.51k £1.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A