TAVISTOCK SWIMMING CLUB (EST. 1990)

Charity number: 1157854
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 16 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 07 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 07 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 26 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 26 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 20 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 29 May 2017 118 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 29 May 2017 118 days late Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)