Trustees TOWNER

Charity number: 1156762
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joseph Long Trustee 12 March 2020
None on record
Jenny Williams Trustee 12 March 2020
None on record
Colin Swansborough Trustee 28 February 2018
THE TREES COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Received: 58 days late
Dr Flora Dennis Trustee 28 February 2018
None on record
Kay Cadell Trustee 01 December 2016
None on record
GYR KING Trustee 07 July 2014
THE GREAT DIXTER CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE GREAT DIXTER CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Dinah Casson CBE RDI Trustee 05 March 2014
THE SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED KINGDOM ARTS TRUST
Overdue by 157 days
HILLARY BAUER Trustee 05 March 2014
THE COMPANY OF ARTS SCHOLARS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
DAVID DIMBLEBY Trustee 05 March 2014
None on record
COLIN MCKENZIE Trustee 05 March 2014
None on record