Financial history THE MICHAEL BARNARD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1157878
Charity reporting is up to date (37 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £50.05k £52.38k £48.54k £34.83k £9.17k
Total expenditure £183.25k £368.93k £434.99k £356.22k £160.80k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A