Accounts and annual returns ST ANDREWS CHURCH, DEVIZES

Charity number: 1156418
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 22 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 22 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 28 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 March 2021 273 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 30 March 2021 273 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 04 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 04 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 20 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 20 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window