ALAMIYAH EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1158578
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £0 £92.06k £241.47k £353.64k £245.34k
Total expenditure £0 £137.69k £215.94k £226.67k £232.64k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £3.35k £84.03k £78.07k £70.24k