Financial history FAVERSHAM FOODBANK

Charity number: 1158413
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £16.76k £61.67k £46.97k £109.83k £80.35k
Total expenditure £7.65k £63.35k £45.30k £64.45k £78.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £17.25k £400 £2.09k N/A