Accounts and annual returns CALVARY STREET CHURCH

Charity number: 1161657
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 13 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 01 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 19 March 2018 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required