Accounts and annual returns HEATH CHRISTIAN BOOKSHOP TRUST

Charity number: 504644
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 17 August 2022 On time
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 21 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 07 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 06 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 20 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 01 August 2018 On time Download Open in new window