Financial history CAMINO WAY LIMITED

Charity number: 1158163
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £15.72k £167 £148 £141 £26.21k
Total expenditure £1.78k £1.05k £2.73k £2.72k £8.60k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A