Accounts and annual returns URCHFONT SCARECROW FESTIVAL CHARITY

Charity number: 1156450
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 10 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 10 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 12 May 2021 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 12 May 2021 12 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 16 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 16 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 16 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 11 March 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2017 16 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 16 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window