Financial history URCHFONT SCARECROW FESTIVAL CHARITY

Charity number: 1156450
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £43.00k £47.74k £56.35k £0 £0
Total expenditure £37.99k £40.18k £38.83k £38.91k £3.33k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A