CHAGFORD JUBILEE HALL TRUST

Charity number: 1158870
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £24.97k £402.47k £33.99k £59.25k £34.56k
Total expenditure £22.15k £11.65k £13.55k £60.56k £30.28k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.00k £1.00k £4.00k N/A £10.40k