Financial history NICOLAUS COPERNICUS POLISH SATURDAY SCHOOL IN BIRMINGHAM

Charity number: 1158308
Charity reporting is overdue by 7 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £47.33k £52.24k £53.79k £68.20k £37.27k
Total expenditure £39.57k £49.60k £55.30k £60.28k £38.99k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A