EDIBLE YORK

Charity number: 1158779
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 17 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 16 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required