EDIBLE YORK

Charity number: 1158779
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr David Percival Gibbon Trustee 07 December 2020 None on record
MR BILL EVE Trustee 06 January 2014 None on record
Ruth Jennaway Trustee 13 October 2014 None on record
Stephen Symonds Trustee 07 December 2020 None on record
MS PENNY BAINBRIDGE Trustee 10 January 2014
UK FRIENDS OF KHWENDO KOR Received: On time
Daniel William Minshull-Beech Trustee 09 May 2019 None on record