Financial history THE GAUDIO FAMILY FOUNDATION (UK) LIMITED

Charity number: 1157301
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.16m £4.90m £6.59m £8.18m £15.41m
Total expenditure £85.50k £280.25k £2.47m £3.19m £5.24m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £4.16m £4.90m £6.59m £8.14m £15.26m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £629 £0 £0 £33.87k £153.13k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £85.50k £280.25k £2.47m £3.19m £5.21m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £1.32k £31.54k
Expenditure - Governance £25.50k £14.64k £61.36k £131.69k £176.15k
Expenditure - Grants institution £60.00k £264.05k £2.41m £3.06m £5.03m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £1.32k £31.54k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0