WOOLWICH COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity number: 1157291
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 May 2020 26 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2020 26 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 May 2019 31 March 2020 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2019 31 March 2020 1 days late Download
Annual return 30 May 2018 07 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2018 07 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 May 2017 21 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2017 09 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2016 30 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 12 November 2016 On time Download