WIGTON BATHS TRUST

Charity number: 1159069
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £164.48k £212.76k £160.97k £141.16k £166.41k
Total expenditure £140.28k £150.55k £151.86k £165.12k £155.76k
Income from government contracts £0 £8.94k £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £43.44k £55.96k £45.50k £18.16k £35.00k