WIGTON BATHS TRUST

Charity number: 1159069
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jo Wolloff Trustee 11 June 2017 None on record
Michael Peter Maclean Bryceson Trustee 04 November 2014 None on record
Karen Sloan Trustee 15 September 2020 None on record
Martin Tickner Trustee 15 October 2019 None on record
Kathryne Hodgson Trustee 15 September 2020 None on record
Kathleen Ann Tyson Chair 20 October 2020 None on record
Mave Tyas Trustee 04 November 2014 None on record