Financial history 2MAKEIT

Charity number: 1157740
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £21.88k £10.27k £29.78k £42.43k £45.15k
Total expenditure £26.10k £19.59k £19.96k £18.98k £29.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A