BRECON FOOD BANK

Charity number: 1157203
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev TIMOTHY WILLIAMS Trustee 20 February 2014 None on record
Patricia Richardson Trustee 04 November 2020
HAY AND DISTRICT DIAL-A-RIDE Received: On time
Lucinda Bugler Trustee 06 August 2014 None on record
Susan Elizabeth Williams Chair 11 October 2017 None on record
Rev Mark Forbes Moreton Clavier Trustee 05 February 2019
THE LLANGASTY RETREAT HOUSE TRUST
Elisabeth Lifford Trustee 04 November 2020 None on record
Alun Edward Hutchinson Trustee 01 December 2016 None on record