ADINATH CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1160214
Charity reporting is up to date (77 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 15/01/2016 15/01/2017 16/01/2018 16/01/2019 16/01/2020
Total gross income £9.86k £13.77k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £9.86k £11.65k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A