Financial history RIGHT CHOICE ACADEMY

Charity number: 1161957
Charity reporting is up to date (177 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £500 £0 £3.50k £1.62k £600
Total expenditure £870 £1.08k £660 £738 £687
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A